Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Joaquín Morón

Deceased

Bishop of Valladolid, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1725Born
26 Sep 178560.5AppointedBishop of Valladolid, Spain
20 Nov 178560.6Ordained BishopBishop of Valladolid, Spain
27 Feb 180175.9DiedBishop of Valladolid, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Joaquín Morón
Bishop Manuel Joaquín Morón (born , died ) Bishop of Valladolid

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlmazán

  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 104, Number 537
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 49
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 431

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast