Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Felipe Miralles

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena (en España)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1728³BornSigüenza
27 Jun 178557.0AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
24 Aug 178557.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena (en España)
15 Jul 178860.1DiedBishop of Cartagena (en España)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Felipe Miralles:
Bishop Manuel Felipe Miralles (born , died ) Bishop of Cartagena (en España)

  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 103, Number 535
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 33
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 150

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 16 Jan 2016