Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simón Casaviella López

Deceased

Bishop of Tudela, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1732Born
24 Jul 179764.7AppointedBishop of Tudela, Spain
5 Nov 179765.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tudela, Spain
30 Mar 181683.4DiedBishop of Tudela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Simón Casaviella López
Bishop Simón Casaviella López (born , died ) Bishop of Tudela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJaca
Ordained BishopCalahorra, Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada

  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,655
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 116, Number 606
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 43
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 421
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Number 7,147

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast