Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan García Montenegro

Deceased

Bishop of Urgell, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1716Born
18 Sep 178064.1AppointedBishop of Urgell, Spain
30 Nov 178064.3Ordained BishopBishop of Urgell, Spain
23 May 178366.8DiedBishop of Urgell, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan García Montenegro
Bishop Juan García Montenegro (born , died ) Bishop of Urgell

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLugo

  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 97, Number 500
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1780, Number 36
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 427

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast