Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agustín Rubín Cevallos

Deceased

Bishop of Jaén


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1724³BornDueñas
18 Sep 178056.2AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
26 Nov 178056.4Ordained BishopBishop of Jaén, Spain
8 Feb 179368.6DiedBishop of Jaén, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agustín Rubín Cevallos:
Bishop Agustín Rubín Cevallos (born , died ) Bishop of Jaén

  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 226
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 97, Number 499

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013