Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julián Gascueña Herráiz, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ávila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1717BornGascueña
19 Jun 178062.7AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
16 Jul 178062.8Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
4 Jul 178466.8SelectedBishop of Ávila, Spain
20 Sep 178467.0ConfirmedBishop of Ávila, Spain
23 Nov 179679.2DiedBishop of Ávila, Spain

MicroData Summary for Julián Gascueña Herráiz:
Bishop Julián Gascueña Herráiz O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Ávila

  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 62, and Page 239
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 96, Number 496

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014