Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples

Congregatio pro Gentium Evandelizatione



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Luis Antonio Gokim Tagle, Cardinal, Prefect
  • Protase Rugambwa, Secretary
  • Giovanni Pietro Dal Toso, Adjunct Secretary
  • Ryszard Szmydki, O.M.I., Under Secretary
  • Piergiuseppe Vacchelli, Official Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Congregation
  • Name Changed: 15 August 1967
  • Curial Office
  • Roman Curia
  • Description: direct and coordinate throughout the world the actual work of spreading the Gospel as well as missionary cooperation, without prejudice to the competence of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches. (Pastor Bonus, 85)
  • Section on the Vatican Website: http://www.vatican.va/roman_curia/congregations/cevang/
  • Museum of Propaganda Fide: http://www.museopropagandafide.va/
  • Mailing Address: Palazzo di Propaganda Fide, 00187 Roma, Piazza di Spagna, 48
  • Telephone: 06.69.87.92.99
  • Fax: 06.69.88.01.18; 06.69.88.01.37

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
22 June 1622ErectedCongregation for Propagation of the Faith (erected)
1 May 1917Territory LostCongregation for Propagation of the Faith Congregation for the Oriental Churches (erected)
Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples
15 August 1967Name ChangedCongregation for Propagation of the Faith Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_d, v3.3.4, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 1 Nov 2020

Quantcast