Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edoardo Pecoraio

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Malta

Titular Archbishop of Cumae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1910Born
26 Jul 193524.9Ordained PriestPriest
1961²50.3AppointedUnder Secretary of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples
28 Dec 197161.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cumae
28 Dec 197161.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Malta
13 Feb 197261.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Cumae
1974²63.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Malta
9 Aug 198675.9DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Malta

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edoardo Pecoraio (VIAF: 316469861)
Archbishop Edoardo Pecoraio (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Malta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSant'Egidio alla Vibrata
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 17, Number 890

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast