Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Cardinal Fumasoni Biondi

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1872Born
17 Apr 189724.6Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
14 Nov 191644.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Japan
4 Dec 191644.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Doclea
10 Dec 191644.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Doclea
26 Nov 191947.2AppointedApostolic Delegate to Japan
Mar 1921³48.4ResignedApostolic Delegate to Japan
16 Jun 192148.7AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
14 Dec 192250.2AppointedApostolic Delegate to United States of America
13 Mar 193360.5Elevated to Cardinal
16 Mar 193360.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
16 Mar 193360.5AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
12 Jul 196087.8DiedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Fumasoni Biondi
Pietro Cardinal Fumasoni Biondi (born , died ) Prefect of Propagation of the Faith

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 63.2 years
  • a bishop for 43.5 years
  • a cardinal for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1916, Number 63
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 158
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 179, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 285, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 357, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 411, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 495, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 524, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 647, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 684, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 735, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 842, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,107, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast