Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Domenico Cardinal Serafini, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1852Born
21 Oct 187725.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
5 Jun 189643.8AppointedAbbot of Subiaco, Italy
19 Apr 190047.7AppointedArchbishop of Spoleto, Italy
6 May 190047.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Spoleto, Italy
6 Jan 190451.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to México
2 Mar 191259.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Seleucia Pieria
25 May 191461.8Elevated to Cardinal
28 May 191461.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
27 Jan 191663.4AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Affairs of Religious
26 Feb 191663.5AppointedPro-Prefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
24 Mar 191663.6AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
5 Mar 191865.5DiedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

MicroData Summary for Domenico Serafini (VIAF: 89434041)
Domenico Cardinal Serafini O.S.B. (born , died ) Prefect of Propagation of the Faith

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
  • a cardinal for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 527
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 179, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 285, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 357, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 411, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 495, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 524, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 684, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 735, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 842, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,106, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast