Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Siracusa

Archidioecesis Syracusana



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Francesco Lomanto, Archbishop
  • Giuseppe Costanzo, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Salvatore Pappalardo, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Split: 1 October 1955
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 1,341 (517 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sicilia
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arcidiocesi.siracusa.it/
  • Mailing Address: Arcivescovado, Piazza Duomo 5, 96100 Siracusa, Italia
  • Telephone: 0931.66.571
  • Fax: 0931.46.37.76

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Siracusa
2nd CenturyErectedDiocese of Siracusa (erected)
15 May 1844Territory LostDiocese of Siracusa Diocese of Noto (erected)
Archdiocese of Siracusa
20 May 1844ElevatedDiocese of Siracusa Archdiocese of Siracusa
Archdiocese of Siracusa e Ragusa
6 May 1950Name ChangedArchdiocese of Siracusa Archdiocese of Siracusa e Ragusa
1 October 1955SplitArchdiocese of Siracusa e Ragusa Diocese of Ragusa
Archdiocese of Siracusa
Archdiocese of Siracusa
1 October 1955SplitArchdiocese of Siracusa e Ragusa Diocese of Ragusa
Archdiocese of Siracusa

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Siracusa
1886201,092.0%528029OTC
Archdiocese of Siracusa e Ragusa
Archdiocese of Siracusa
1970267,250269,40099.2%124591831,4607542565ap1971
1978290,800293,87099.0%124601841,5807049567ap1981
1990308,000318,00096.9%123421651,86624535474ap1991
1999331,000335,00098.8%121431642,0184835776ap2000
2000333,000337,00098.8%124421662,00644931376ap2001
2001335,000339,00098.8%123421652,03044931376ap2002
2002320,000330,00097.0%120421621,97554929176ap2003
2003320,000330,00097.0%118331512,11953825576ap2004
2004320,000330,00097.0%116321482,16273723276ap2005
2010320,000330,00097.0%105311362,352133416376ap2011
2014289,162297,28697.3%103371402,065164017176ap2015
2017290,215297,31397.6%111241352,149372913676ap2018

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Siracusa
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 244
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 325
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 366
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 389

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_d, v3.3.4, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 24 Oct 2020

Quantcast