Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Beccadelli Bologna

Deceased

Bishop of Siracusa, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Apr 1541AppointedBishop of Siracusa, Italy
29 Jan 1542Ordained BishopBishop of Siracusa, Italy
16 Jul 1560DiedBishop of Siracusa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Beccadelli Bologna
Bishop Girolamo Beccadelli Bologna (died ) Bishop of Siracusa

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Palermo, Archdiocese of Palermo

  • a bishop for 18.4 years
  • Principal Consecrator:
  • Assisted by:
    • Abbot Tino Planti
      Abbot
    • Abbot Giulio Quaranta de la Cava
      Abbot
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 307
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1542, Number 2
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 69, Number 5,435

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast