Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinando Ricca

Deceased

Bishop of Trapani, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1880Born
19 Dec 190323.1Ordained PriestPriest
12 Aug 193251.8AppointedBishop of Trapani, Italy
21 Dec 193252.1Ordained BishopBishop of Trapani, Italy
3 Apr 194766.4DiedBishop of Trapani, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando Ricca
Bishop Ferdinando Ricca (born , died ) Bishop of Trapani

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVittoria

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1948
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1932, Number 86

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast