Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Impellizzeri

Deceased

Bishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Dec 1650AppointedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
8 Jan 1651Ordained BishopBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
1656¹DiedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Impellizzeri
Bishop Carlo Impellizzeri (died 1656) Bishop of Mazara del Vallo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNoto, Diocese of Siracusa
Ordained BishopSan Silvestro in Monte Cavallo, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 235
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1651, Number 5
  • rem c2+: CB, 19 Dec 2016
  • ob/c2+: AT, 9 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Number 20,264

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast