Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Estevão dos Santos Carneiro de Moraes, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia de Todos os Santos, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1620¹Born
17 Jun 166949.4AppointedBishop of São Salvador da Bahia de Todos os Santos, Brazil
24 May 167151.3Ordained BishopBishop of São Salvador da Bahia de Todos os Santos, Brazil
15 Apr 167252.2InstalledBishop of São Salvador da Bahia de Todos os Santos, Brazil
6 Jul 167252.5DiedBishop of São Salvador da Bahia de Todos os Santos, Brazil

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Estevão dos Santos Carneiro de Moraes
Bishop Estevão dos Santos Carneiro de Moraes C.R.S.A. (born 1620, died ) Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia de Todos os Santos

EventPlace
Birth PlacePortalegre

  • a bishop for 1.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,678
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 20
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Apr 2021

Quantcast