Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Lopes Simões

Deceased

Bishop of Portalegre


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1676¹BornCascais
6 Mar 170024.1Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 173963.1SelectedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
19 Dec 174064.9ConfirmedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
19 Feb 174165.1Ordained BishopBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
27 Aug 174266.6InstalledBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
15 May 174872.3DiedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Lopes Simões:
Bishop Manuel Lopes Simões (born 1676, died ) Bishop of Portalegre

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,073
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 344
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015