Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António Ferreira Gomes

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Porto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1906BornS. Martinho de Melhundos
22 Sep 192822.3Ordained PriestPriest of Porto, Portugal
15 Jan 194841.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Portalegre, Portugal
15 Jan 194841.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhandus
2 May 194841.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhandus
6 Jul 194943.1SucceededBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
13 Jul 195246.1AppointedBishop of Porto, Portugal
12 Feb 198275.7RetiredBishop of Porto, Portugal
13 Apr 198982.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Porto, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António Ferreira Gomes:
Bishop António Ferreira Gomes (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Porto

  • a priest for 60.5 years
  • a bishop for 40.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015