Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Arauca

Dioecesis Araucensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Jaime Muñoz Pedroza, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 19 July 1984
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Nueva Pamplona
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Colombia
  • Square Kilometers: 32,490 (12,549 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Casa Episcopal, Calle 21 N. 19-23, Arauca, Intendencia de Arauca, Columbia
  • Telephone: (7) 885.20.90
  • Fax: 885.68.69

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Arauca
26 May 1915ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Casanare Prefecture Apostolic of Arauca (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Arauca
11 November 1970ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Arauca Vicariate Apostolic of Arauca
Diocese of Arauca
19 July 1984ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Arauca Diocese of Arauca

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Arauca
195032,00034,00094.1%993,55513174ap1951
196660,00060,000100.0%419232,608212311ap1967
Vicariate Apostolic of Arauca
196869,70075,00092.9%1016262,680183012ap1971
1976153,102158,00096.9%179265,888115012ap1977
1980131,800135,20097.5%177245,49175913ap1981
Diocese of Arauca
1990151,000174,00086.8%176236,56585915ap1991
1999198,945248,68180.0%2210326,217105717ap2000
2000202,000248,75081.2%237306,73385615ap2001
2001202,000248,75081.2%317385,31575520ap2002
2002220,000260,00084.6%349435,11695321ap2003
2003230,000260,00088.5%355405,75055222ap2004
2004232,000262,00088.5%355405,80055122ap2005
2006238,000268,00088.8%316376,43264922ap2007
2012264,000288,00091.7%434475,61744624ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 29 Sep 2013