Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Evaristo Blanco

Deceased

Bishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1855Born
16 Aug 188024.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Sep 188125.8Ordained PriestPriest
19 Apr 189741.4AppointedBishop of Socorro, Colombia
8 Sep 189741.8Ordained BishopBishop of Socorro, Colombia
27 Mar 190953.4AppointedBishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia
15 Sep 191559.8DiedBishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Evaristo Blanco (VIAF: 2018401)
Bishop Evaristo Blanco (born , died ) Bishop of Nueva Pamplona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Miguel, Diocese of Nueva Pamplona
Ordained BishopSt. Laurent, Bucaramanga, Diocese of Nueva Pamplona

  • a priest for 34.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 523
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017