Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rafael Afanador y Cadena

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia

Titular Archbishop of Pompeiopolis in Cilicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1871Born
3 Jul 189827.2Ordained PriestPriest of Socorro, Colombia
5 Jun 191645.1AppointedBishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia
3 Sep 191645.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia
29 May 195685.1RetiredBishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia
29 May 195685.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pompeiopolis in Cilicia
5 Mar 195785.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Rafael Afanador y Cadena
Archbishop Rafael Afanador y Cadena (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nueva Pamplona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarichara

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 40.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast