Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Alberto Rolón Güepsa

Bishop of Montería


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1959 BornArboledas
8 Dec 198425.8Ordained PriestPriest of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia
27 Oct 201253.7AppointedBishop of Montería, Colombia
1 Dec 201253.8Ordained BishopBishop of Montería, Colombia
15 Dec 201253.8InstalledBishop of Montería, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Ramón Alberto Rolón Güepsa:
Bishop Ramón Alberto Rolón Güepsa (born ) Bishop of Montería

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Montería.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Oct 2012
  • ob/i: CB, 27 Oct 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,610

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013