Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Macerata-Tolentino-Recanati-Cingoli-Treia

Dioecesis Maceratensis-Tolentinus-Recinetensis-Cingulanus-Treiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • United: 25 January 1985
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Fermo
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 745 (287 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Marche
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesimacerata.it/
  • Mailing Address: Piazza S. Vincenzo Strambi 3, 62100 Macerata, Italia
  • Telephone: 0733.23.00.92
  • Fax: 0733.26.33.86

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Macerata
18 November 1320ErectedDiocese of Macerata (erected)
Diocese of Macerata e Tolentino
10 December 1586UnitedDiocese of Macerata
Diocese of Tolentino
Diocese of Macerata e Tolentino
Diocese of Macerata-Tolentino-Recanati-Cingoli-Treia
25 January 1985UnitedDiocese of Macerata e Tolentino
Diocese of Osimo e Cingoli
Diocese of Recanati
Diocese of San Severino (-Treia)
Diocese of Macerata-Tolentino-Recanati-Cingoli-Treia

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Macerata e Tolentino
195040,00040,000100.0%6729964162916217ap1951
197068,46568,54799.9%88711594308419736ap1971
198052,01052,41299.2%59551144566516825ap1981
Diocese of Macerata-Tolentino-Recanati-Cingoli-Treia
1990132,381133,32399.3%128117245540113724767ap1991
1999134,800137,25898.2%116102218618413420167ap2000
2000133,290136,03098.0%121100221603411619467ap2001
2001134,750138,20097.5%11999218618411619867ap2002
2002128,600132,30097.2%11599214600411715967ap2003
2003134,556138,47897.2%11999218617512915067ap2004
2004134,412138,94096.7%12182203662510314567ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 15 Apr 2014