Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cesare Costa, C.O. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Capua, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1530¹Born
19 Nov 157242.8AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
Dec 1572²42.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Capua, Italy
22 Jun 158555.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
Dec 1587³57.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
2 Feb 160272.0DiedArchbishop of Capua, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cesare Costa (VIAF: 57517654)
Archbishop Cesare Costa C.O. (born 1530, died ) Archbishop of Capua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMacerata, Diocese of Macerata
Death PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a bishop for 29.1 years

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 263
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1572, Number 28*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 151

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 3 Nov 2018

Quantcast