Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Cini

Deceased

Bishop of Macerata e Tolentino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1610¹BornOsimo
26 Sep 166050.7Ordained PriestPriest
15 Nov 1660¹50.8AppointedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
21 Nov 1660¹50.8Ordained BishopBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
May 1684³74.3DiedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Cini:
Bishop Francesco Cini (born 1610, died May 1684) Bishop of Macerata e Tolentino

  • a priest for 23.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 123, Number 748
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 227
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1660, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015