Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cornelio Firmano

Deceased

Bishop of Osimo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1532¹Born
15 Jan 157442.0AppointedBishop of Osimo, Italy
21 Feb 157442.1Ordained BishopBishop of Osimo, Italy
5 Jul 158856.5DiedBishop of Osimo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cornelio Firmano (VIAF: 311005076)
Bishop Cornelio Firmano (born 1532, died ) Bishop of Osimo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMacerata, Diocese of Macerata
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceMacerata, Diocese of Macerata e Tolentino

  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: CB, 29 Sep 2011
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 125
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1574, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast