Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Argnani

Deceased

Bishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1880Born
25 Sep 190424.0Ordained PriestPriest
30 Sep 193151.0AppointedBishop of Conversano, Italy
6 Dec 193151.1Ordained BishopBishop of Conversano, Italy
15 Jun 193554.7AppointedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
1 Oct 194767.0DiedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Argnani
Bishop Domenico Argnani (born , died ) Bishop of Macerata e Tolentino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrisighella

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,948
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,931, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast