Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignazio Stelluti

Deceased

Bishop of Macerata e Tolentino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jan 1685BornFabrianen
21 Sep 171328.7Ordained PriestPriest
2 Dec 173550.9AppointedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
21 Dec 173551.0Ordained BishopBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
5 May 175671.3DiedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ignazio Stelluti:
Bishop Ignazio Stelluti (died ) Bishop of Macerata e Tolentino

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013