Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Umberto Cardinal Mozzoni

Deceased

Official of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eugenio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1904Born
14 Aug 192723.1Ordained PriestPriest of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
13 Nov 195450.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Side
13 Nov 195450.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bolivia
5 Dec 195450.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Side
20 Sep 195854.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Argentina
19 Apr 196964.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Brazil
197368.5AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
5 Mar 197368.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eugenio
5 Mar 197368.6Elevated to Cardinal
2 Feb 198378.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eugenio
7 Nov 198379.3DiedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Umberto Mozzoni (VIAF: 89248538)
Umberto Cardinal Mozzoni (born , died ) Official of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires, Argentina

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 28.9 years
  • a cardinal for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast