Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alessandro Alessandretti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Macerata e Tolentino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1738BornImola
29 Sep 176527.7Ordained PriestPriest
Nov 1786³48.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Comacchio, Italy
18 Dec 178648.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Zama Major
14 Jan 178749.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zama Major
27 Jun 179658.4AppointedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
6 Dec 180062.9ResignedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
10 Jul 181577.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Alessandretti
Archbishop Alessandro Alessandretti (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Macerata e Tolentino

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 174, and Page 270
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 449
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 247
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1787, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016