Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léonard Goetz

Deceased

Bishop of Lavant, Slovenia


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Jan 1619AppointedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
12 Jul 1620Ordained BishopBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
28 Nov 1640DiedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Léonard Goetz
Bishop Léonard Goetz (died ) Bishop of Lavant

EventPlace
Ordained BishopHofkirche, Graz

  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 217
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,620, Number 10
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 23, Number 1,314

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast