Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymund Anton von Strasoldo

Deceased

Bishop of Eichstätt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1718³BornGraz
27 May 174123.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lavant, Slovenia
11 Jun 174123.1Ordained PriestPriest of Lavant, Slovenia
5 Jul 175739.1SelectedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
26 Sep 175739.4ConfirmedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
30 Apr 175840.0Ordained BishopBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
13 Jan 178162.7DiedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raymund Anton von Strasoldo:
Bishop Raymund Anton von Strasoldo (born , died ) Bishop of Eichstätt

  • a priest for 39.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1758, Number 9
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 212

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 20 Nov 2015