Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignaz Franz Sales Zimmermann

Deceased

Bishop of Lavant


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1777BornWindisch Feistritz
8 Jun 180022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Lavant, Slovenia
19 May 182446.8AppointedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
12 Sep 182447.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
28 Sep 184366.2DiedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Ignaz Franz Sales Zimmermann:
Bishop Ignaz Franz Sales Zimmermann (born , died ) Bishop of Lavant

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 233

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013