Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marjan Turnšek

Archbishop Emeritus of Maribor


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1955 BornCelje
28 Jun 198125.9Ordained PriestPriest of Maribor, Slovenia
7 Apr 200650.7AppointedBishop of Murska Sobota, Slovenia
25 Jun 200650.9Ordained BishopBishop of Murska Sobota, Slovenia
28 Nov 200954.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Maribor, Slovenia
3 Feb 201155.5SucceededArchbishop of Maribor, Slovenia
31 Jul 201358.0ResignedArchbishop of Maribor, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Marjan Turnšek:
Archbishop Marjan Turnšek (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Maribor

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Maribor.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Apr 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,177
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Nov 2009
  • s: Bollettino, 3 Feb 2011
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013