Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ivan Josip Tomazic

Deceased

Bishop of Lavant


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1876BornSvetnik Miklavz pri Ormozu
5 Dec 189822.3Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jun 192851.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lavant, Slovenia
8 Jun 192851.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Bargala
1 Aug 192852.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bargala
27 Jun 193356.9AppointedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
27 Feb 194972.5DiedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Ivan Josip Tomazic:
Bishop Ivan Josip Tomazic (born , died ) Bishop of Lavant

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1950
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015