Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Joseph Franz Anton Cardinal von Auersperg

Deceased

Bishop of Passau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1734BornWien
175722.9Ordained PriestPriest of Passau, Germany
31 Jan 176329.0AppointedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
22 May 176329.3Ordained BishopBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
4 Jan 176429.9ResignedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
18 Oct 177238.7SelectedBishop of Gurk, Austria
31 Jan 177339.0ConfirmedBishop of Gurk, Austria
19 May 178349.3SelectedBishop of Passau, Germany
25 Jun 178450.4ConfirmedBishop of Passau, Germany
30 Mar 178955.2Elevated to Cardinal
21 Aug 179561.6DiedBishop of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Joseph Franz Anton von Auersperg:
Cardinal Joseph Franz Anton von Auersperg (born , died ) Bishop of Passau

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
  • a cardinal for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Mar 1789

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013