Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Štumpf, S.D.B.

Bishop of Murska Sobota


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1962 BornBeltinci
29 Jun 199028.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
24 May 200643.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Maribor, Slovenia
24 May 200643.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Musti in Numidia
10 Sep 200644.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Musti in Numidia
28 Nov 200947.4AppointedBishop of Murska Sobota, Slovenia
10 Jan 201047.5InstalledBishop of Murska Sobota, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Peter Štumpf:
Bishop Peter Štumpf S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Murska Sobota

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Murska Sobota.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 May 2006
  • ob: CB
  • c3+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,242
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Nov 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013