Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philipp Carl von Fürstenberg

Deceased

Bishop of Lavant


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1669Born
11 Apr 170839.0SelectedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
1 May 170839.1Ordained PriestPriest
30 May 170839.2ConfirmedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
9 Jun 170940.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
14 Feb 171848.9DiedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Philipp Carl von Fürstenberg:
Bishop Philipp Carl von Fürstenberg (born , died ) Bishop of Lavant

  • a priest for 9.7 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 239
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1709, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 29 Jun 2015