Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alojzij Cvikl, S.J.

Archbishop of Maribor, Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1955 Born
28 Mar 198327.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Society of Jesus
3 Jul 198328.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
15 Aug 199338.1Solemn VowsPriest of Society of Jesus
14 Mar 201559.7AppointedArchbishop of Maribor, Slovenia
26 Apr 201559.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Maribor, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Alojzij Cvikl
Archbishop Alojzij Cvikl S.J. (born ) Archbishop of Maribor

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCelje

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Maribor.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Mar 2015
  • ob: CB, 14 Mar 2015
  • c2+: CB, 17 Apr 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,485
  • od/c1/sole: CB, 12 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast