Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonhard Pewerl (Peurl)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lavant, Slovenia


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Nov 1508AppointedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
21 Jan 1509Ordained BishopBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
2 Sep 1533ResignedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Leonhard Pewerl (Peurl)
Bishop Leonhard Pewerl (Peurl) , Bishop Emeritus of Lavant

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1509, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 221

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 29 Jun 2018

Quantcast