Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastian von Pötting-Persing

Deceased

Bishop of Passau, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1628²Born
3 Apr 166537.2AppointedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
24 Apr 166537.3Ordained BishopBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
11 Mar 167345.1SelectedBishop of Passau, Germany
25 Sep 167345.7ConfirmedBishop of Passau, Germany
16 Mar 168961.2DiedBishop of Passau, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastian von Pötting-Persing (VIAF: 5665951)
Bishop Sebastian von Pötting-Persing (born 1628, died ) Bishop of Passau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReitpollenbach
Ordained BishopPassau, Diocese of Passau

  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 217
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1665, Number 25
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Number 19,395

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Jul 2017