Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Mario Cardinal Mocenni

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1823Born
27 May 184522.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Dec 184522.9Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jul 187754.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Heliopolis in Phoenicia
6 Aug 187754.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Ecuador
6 Aug 187754.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Peru
6 Aug 187754.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Bolivia
6 Aug 187754.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Chile
12 Aug 187754.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Heliopolis in Phoenicia
14 Aug 187754.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Venezuela
14 Aug 187754.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Guatemala
14 Aug 187754.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Costa Rica
14 Aug 187754.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Honduras
14 Aug 187754.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Nicaragua
27 Feb 188259.0AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Brazil
16 Dec 188259.9AppointedSubstitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State
16 Jan 189369.9Elevated to Cardinal
16 Jan 189369.9ResignedSubstitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State
19 Jan 189369.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola
18 May 189471.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
14 Nov 190481.8DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

MicroData Summary for Mario Mocenni
Mario Cardinal Mocenni (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontefiascone, Diocese of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
Ordained BishopPropaganda, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceApostolic Palace, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Propaganda Fide Chapel, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.2 years
  • a cardinal for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 301, and Page 45
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 46
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Jan 1893
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1877, Number 25
  • xsta/nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 33, and Page 69, and Page 78
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 87, and Page 111, and Page 203

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast