Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gabriele Cardinal Ferretti

Deceased

Secretary Emeritus of the Secretariat of State

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Titular See: (Sicily)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1795BornAncona
1 Jun 181722.3Ordained PriestPriest
21 May 182732.3AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
27 May 182732.3Ordained BishopBishop of Rieti, Italy
29 Jul 183338.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
30 Jul 183338.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Other
19 May 183742.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
2 Oct 183742.7AppointedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
30 Nov 183843.8Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
8 Jul 183944.4Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jan 184246.9ResignedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
14 Mar 184348.1AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics
22 Dec 184651.9AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
5 Jul 184752.4AppointedSecretary of State
1 Feb 184853.0ResignedSecretary of State
12 Sep 185358.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
13 Sep 186065.6DiedSecretary Emeritus of the Secretariat of State

MicroData Summary for Gabriele Ferretti:
Cardinal Gabriele Ferretti (born , died ) Secretary Emeritus of State

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 33.3 years
  • a cardinal for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 45
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 195, and Page 270
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 319, and Page 341

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013