Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Egidio (Giovanni) Cardinal Mauri, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Ferrara, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1828Born
24 Sep 185324.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
22 Dec 187143.0AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
14 Jan 187243.0Ordained BishopBishop of Rieti, Italy
1 Jun 188859.4AppointedBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
12 Jun 189364.5AppointedArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy
18 May 189465.4Elevated to Cardinal
21 May 189465.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola
2 Dec 189566.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
13 Mar 189667.2DiedArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Egidio (Giovanni) Mauri (VIAF: 89293915)
Egidio (Giovanni) Cardinal Mauri O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Ferrara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontefiscone, Diocese of Montefiascone
Ordained PriestViterbo, Diocese of Viterbo e Tuscania
Ordained BishopSanta Maria della Quercia, La Quercia, Diocese of Viterbo e Tuscania
Death PlaceFerrara, Archdiocese of Ferrara
Buried Place (Original)Metropolitan Chapter Chapel, Certosa, Ferrara, Archdiocese of Ferrara

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
  • a cardinal for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 134, and Page 270
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 477, and Page 46
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 50
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Number 14,361
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 May 1894
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017