Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bonaventura (Domenico Giuseppe) Cardinal Gazzola, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone

Cardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1744BornPiacenza
7 Jun 176117.1ProfessedMember of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
4 Apr 176722.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
1 Jun 179551.1AppointedBishop of Cervia, Italy
7 Jun 179551.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cervia, Italy
Jun 1814³70.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
21 Feb 182075.8AppointedBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
3 May 182480.0Elevated to Cardinal
24 May 182480.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola
29 Jan 183287.7DiedBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bonaventura (Domenico Giuseppe) Gazzola
Bonaventura (Domenico Giuseppe) Cardinal Gazzola O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Bishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone

  • a priest for 64.8 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
  • a cardinal for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 160
  • b/c2+: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 3 May 1824
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 270
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1795, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 28 Feb 2016