Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario Antonio Maffei

Deceased

Bishop of Foligno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1691³BornMonte Grimano
19 Sep 171625.6Ordained PriestPriest
27 Nov 174150.8AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
17 Dec 174150.9Ordained BishopBishop of Foligno, Italy
12 Apr 175261.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
1754¹62.9ResignedVicar Apostolic of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
29 May 177786.3DiedBishop of Foligno, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mario Antonio Maffei:
Bishop Mario Antonio Maffei (born , died ) Bishop of Foligno

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 35.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 220, and Page 294
  • ob/c2: CB, 16 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,043
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,138
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1741, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015