Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Bovieri

Deceased

Bishop of Montefiascone, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1800Born
27 Oct 182222.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 186766.8AppointedBishop of Montefiascone, Italy
24 Mar 186766.9Ordained BishopBishop of Montefiascone, Italy
22 Apr 187373.0DiedBishop of Montefiascone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Bovieri
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Bovieri (born , died ) Bishop of Montefiascone

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCeccano, Diocese of Ferentino
Ordained BishopSte Catherine de Sienne au Quirinal, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 393
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,867, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast