Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Joseph Casey

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Brentwood, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1913Born
3 Jun 193925.5Ordained PriestPriest of Westminster, England, Great Britain
23 Dec 196552.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
23 Dec 196552.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Sufar
2 Feb 196652.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sufar
2 Dec 196956.0AppointedBishop of Brentwood, England, Great Britain
2 Feb 197056.2InstalledBishop of Brentwood, England, Great Britain
12 Dec 197966.0ResignedBishop of Brentwood, England, Great Britain
26 Jan 199985.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Brentwood, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Patrick Joseph Casey
Bishop Patrick Joseph Casey (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Brentwood

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStoke Newington, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Ordained PriestMost Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Ordained BishopMost Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Death PlaceOur Lady of Lourdes and St. Joseph, Church, Leigh-on-Sea, Essex, Diocese of Brentwood, England
Buried Place (Original)Churchyard, Sts. Mary and Helen, Cathedral, Brentwood, Essex, Diocese of Brentwood, England

  • a priest for 59.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 61
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast