Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Ambrose Griffiths, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hexham and Newcastle, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1928BornTwickenham
25 Sep 195122.8ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
21 Jul 195728.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
11 Jan 199263.1AppointedBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
20 Mar 199263.3Ordained BishopBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
26 Mar 200475.3RetiredBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
14 Jun 201182.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Michael Ambrose Griffiths:
Bishop Michael Ambrose Griffiths O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hexham and Newcastle

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,661
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013