Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Declan Ronan Lang

Bishop of Clifton, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1950 Born
7 Jun 197525.1Ordained PriestPriest of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain
27 Feb 200150.8AppointedBishop of Clifton, England, Great Britain
28 Mar 200150.9Ordained BishopBishop of Clifton, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Declan Ronan Lang
Bishop Declan Ronan Lang (born ) Bishop of Clifton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCowes

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Clifton.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,952

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018