Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Lucas Wang Shou-qian (Shou Shien)] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Yongnian [YŁngnien], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1888²Born
6 Apr 195870.2SelectedBishop of Yongnian [YŁngnien], China
20 Apr 195870.3Ordained BishopBishop of Yongnian [YŁngnien], China
27 Mar 198799.2DiedBishop of Yongnian [YŁngnien], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lucas Wang Shou-qian (Shou Shien)
Bishop Lucas Wang Shou-qian (Shou Shien) (born 1888, died ) Bishop of Yongnian [YŁngnien]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Xianxian, Diocese of Xianxian [Sienhsien]

  • a bishop for 28.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14*, Number 4
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,236

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast